EP0875681 - Electrohydraulic actuator for brakes for industrial plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmannröhren-Werke AG Wiesenstrasse 36 45473 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | [2003/27] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Mannesmannröhren-Werke AG Wiesenstr. 36 45473 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitz, Werner Kolumbusstrasse 23 47259 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Berlin, Frank Spitzwegstrasse 63 47447 Moers / DE | 03 /
Gohres, Hans-Werner Akazienweg 18 47239 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Bornebusch, Karl-Erich Alt Langst 21 40668 Meerbusch / DE | 05 /
Asmus, Norbert Hochemmericher Strasse 183 47441 Moers / DE | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98250124.9 | 07.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | DE1997119080 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19719080 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875681 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875681 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875681 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/18 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
F16D55/2245 (EP);
F16D59/02 (EP);
F16D65/18 (EP);
F15B15/18 (EP);
F15B15/202 (EP);
F15B2211/20515 (EP);
F15B2211/20538 (EP);
F15B2211/212 (EP);
F15B2211/50518 (EP);
F15B2211/50536 (EP);
F15B2211/5157 (EP);
F15B2211/6309 (EP);
F15B2211/6336 (EP);
F15B2211/6651 (EP);
F15B2211/7052 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, NL [2003/03] |
Former [2000/40] | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrohydraulisches Betätigungsgerät für Bremsen für Industrieanlagen | [1998/45] | English: | Electrohydraulic actuator for brakes for industrial plant | [1998/45] | French: | Vérin électrohydraulique pour les freins de l'équipement industriel | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.07.2003 | NL | 02.07.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/10] | NL | 02.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3707844 (BROOKS R, et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 2, lines 9-46 - column 4, lines 23-57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3848411 (STRAWN C) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4627235 (KINDERMANN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US4642986 (CHATELIN JACQUES H [FR]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |