EP0883091 - Admission document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shape CD Europe GmbH Am Graben 3 18182 Bentwisch / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states c.u.b.a. Media und Entertainment Aktiengesellschaft Innovative Multimedia Marketing Concepte, Sierksdorferstrasse 29-31 23730 Neustadt/Holstein / DE | ||
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states c.u.b.a. GmbH Innovative Multimedia Marketing Concepte, Sierksdorferstrasse 29-31 23730 Neustadt/Holstein / DE | ||
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states W.O.M. GmbH Innovative Produkte für Medizin und Technik Alte Poststrasse 11 96337 Ludwigsstadt / DE | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Cuba GmbH, International Marketing Concept Kaiserin-Augusta-Allee 113 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindinger, Werner Gachenauer Strasse 1 82211 Herrsching / DE | 02 /
Wright, Johnny 606 Viscaya Blvd. 32819 Orlando / US | [2000/01] |
Former [1998/50] | 01 /
Wiest, Peter P. Hessenallee 8 14052 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Lindinger, Werner Gachenauer Strasse 1 82211 Herrsching / DE | |||
03 /
Wright, Johnny 606 Viscaya Blvd. 32819 Orlando / US | Representative(s) | Rohmeyer, Daniel Holmer Weg 6 D-23730 Neustadt in Holstein / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2003/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/27] | Bamberger, Stephan (DE) Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 73 04 66 D-22124 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/50] | Lüke, Dierck-Wilm, Dipl.-Ing. Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98250190.0 | 02.06.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | DE1997210282U | 06.06.1997 Original published format: DE 29710282 U | [1998/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0883091 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0883091 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883091 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G11B23/00, G11B23/28 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
G11B23/282 (EP);
G06K19/044 (EP);
G07C9/20 (EP);
G11B23/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/50] | Extension states | AL | 19.07.2000 | LT | 19.07.2000 | LV | 19.07.2000 | MK | 19.07.2000 | RO | 19.07.2000 | SI | 19.07.2000 | Title | German: | Einlassdokument | [1998/50] | English: | Admission document | [1998/50] | French: | Document d'accès | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Request for further processing for: | 07.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2000 | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.03.2004 | AT | 02.06.2004 | FI | 02.06.2004 | LU | 02.06.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | ES | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | FR | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/14] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
AT | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
AT | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0440586 ; | [A]US4868373 (OPHEIJ WILLEM G [NL], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0514156 (SPECTOR DONALD [US]); | [A]US5265916 (COE ROBERT P [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]DE4310576 (WENZEL GEORG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 16; figure .; claim 9 *; | [A]DE29616619U (BLAHA FRANTISEK ING [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920521), vol. 016, no. 218, Database accession no. (P - 1357), & JP04040586 A 19920210 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |