EP0907259 - CDMA receiving method and receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Masahiro c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98250347.6 | 30.09.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | JP19970269052 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: JP 26905297 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907259 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907259 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907259 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
H04B1/7097 (EP,US);
H04B1/7113 (KR);
H04B1/709 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/50] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | CDMA-Empfangsverfahren und Empfänger | [1999/14] | English: | CDMA receiving method and receiver | [1999/14] | French: | Procede de reception et recepteur AMDC | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0865205 ; | [DY]EP0658985 (NEC CORP [JP]) [DY] 1-9 * column 1, line 24 - column 1, line 49 * * column 4, line 14 - column 8, line 14 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0658991 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 53 * * column 10, line 38 - column 11, line 25 * * column 12, line 33 - column 12, line 58 ** figures 2,5,6; claims 5-7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08065205 A 19960308 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *;; figures 1,2,3A,3B * |