EP0856247 - Gang-type rotary lawn mower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RANSOMES AMERICA CORPORATION 900 North 21st Street Lincoln Nebraska 68501 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states RANSOMES AMERICA CORPORATION 900 North 21st Street Lincoln, Nebraska 68501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bednar, Richard D. N6804 Shorewood Hills Road Lake Mills, Wisconsin 53551 / US | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Carpenter, David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300106.6 | 08.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | US19970794141 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: US 794141 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856247 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856247 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01D75/30 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
A01D75/30 (EP,US);
Y10S56/03 (EP,US);
Y10S56/10 (EP,US);
Y10S56/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gruppen-Rasenmähmaschine | [1998/32] | English: | Gang-type rotary lawn mower | [1998/32] | French: | Tondeuse rotative à dispositifs faucheurs disposés par groupe | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0342700 (TORRAS ROBERT M) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO8805998 (TORO CO [US]) [A] 1-3,6,7,12,13 * page 11, line 3 - page 15, line 22 *; | [A]EP0569836 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,2,12 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]US5280695 (NUNES JR JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-7,12,13 * column W *; | [A]US2936561 (GRIMES CHARLES E) [A] 3 * column 3, line 38 - line 49; figure 3 *; | [A]NL7804519 (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC); | [A]US5497604 (LONN DANA R [US]); | [A]US1961710 (BAPTISTE POL JOHN) |