EP0853058 - Coiler apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belmont Textile Machinery Co., Inc. P.O. Box 352 Belmont North Carolina 28012 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states Belmont Textile Machinery Co., Inc. P.O. Box 352 Belmont North Carolina 28012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hand, Edward Lowe 113, Lynnbrook Drive Belmont, North Carolina 28012 / US | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Neill, Alastair William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Neill, Alastair William, et al APPLEYARD LEES 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300109.0 | 08.01.1998 | [1998/29] | Priority number, date | US19970780458 | 08.01.1997 Original published format: US 780458 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0853058 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0853058 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0853058 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/82 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
D06B17/005 (EP,US);
B65H54/82 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/29] | B65H1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/46] |
Former [1999/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ablegen von fadenförmigen Gut | [1998/29] | English: | Coiler apparatus and method | [1998/29] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour déposer des boucles de fil | [1998/29] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 03.06.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.1999 | 06.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.1999 | 06.09.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.1999 | 06.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.1999 | 06.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3120689 (WENDELL DRUMMOND WARREN) [Y] 1-18 * column W *; | [Y]US3443605 (BITTMAN JESS C, et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1560007 (BUDDECKE HEINRICH); | [A]FR2621569 (CROON LUCKE MASCHINEN [DE]); | [DA]US5024390 (ENDERLIN ROBERT [FR]) |