EP0854188 - Streptococcus pneumoniae aroE polypeptides and polynucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smithkline Beecham One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [1998/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnham, Martin K.R., SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 1250 South Collegeville Road, P.O. Box 5089 Collegeville, PA 19426-0989 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300361.7 | 20.01.1998 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | US19970036125P | 21.01.1997 Original published format: US 36125 P | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854188 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854188 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12Q1/68, C12N15/62, C07K16/12, G01N33/566, A61K38/44 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
C12N9/0006 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/42] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Streptococcus pneumoniae aroE Polypeptiden und Polynuleotiden | [1998/30] | English: | Streptococcus pneumoniae aroE polypeptides and polynucleotides | [1998/30] | French: | Streptococcus pneumoniae aroE polypeptides et polynucléotides | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5187071 (FISCHER RANDY S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15,17,18,20-26 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 28; figure 1; examples 5-10 * * column 15, line 29 - line 32 *; | [A]WO9533843 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-14,17,18 * figures 1,4 *; | [E]WO9818931 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15,26* SEQ ID NO 86; page 682 - page 693; claims 1,8-20 *; | [Y] - SATO ET AL., "Bacillus subtilis DNA, 283 kb region containing skin element", EMBL ACC NO. D84432, (19960509), XP002122646 [Y] 1-15,17,18,20-26 * From bp. 74142 until 74984 * | [D] - HENNER ET AL., "The organization and nucleotide sequence of the Bacillus subtilis HisH, tyrA and AroE genes", GENE, (1986), vol. 49, pages 147 - 462, XP002122644 [D] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(86)90394-X | [A] - DEKA ET AL., "The characterisation of the shikimate pathway enzyme dehydroquinase from Pisum sativum", FEBS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 349, pages 397 - 402, XP002122643 [A] 22 * page 398, paragraph 3.2 - page 400, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(94)00710-1 | [A] - LOURENCO ET AL., "Purification and properties of shikimate dehydrogenase from cucumber (Cucumis sativus L.)", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 458 - 462, XP002122642 [A] 22 * abstract * * page 459, column 1 * * page 460; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00003a006 |