EP0855714 - Digital signal editing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Mikita, c/o Intell. Prop. Dept. 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Tahara, Katsumi, c/o Intell. Prop. Dept. 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Motoki, c/o Intell. Prop. Dept. 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300418.5 | 21.01.1998 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | JP19970010497 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1049797 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855714 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855714 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/50 (KR);
G11B2020/00057 (KR);
G11B2220/2516 (KR);
G11B2220/2525 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/61 (KR);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/18] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnittgerät für digitale Signale und Verfahren | [1998/31] | English: | Digital signal editing apparatus and method | [1998/31] | French: | Appareil d'édition pour signaux numériques et méthode | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 27.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/23] | 16.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9321636 (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-15 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0778572 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,10 * column 6, line 3 - column 12, line 30 *; | [A]EP0684570 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,4-6,10,13-15 * the whole document * | [X] - SHIU J ET AL, "A LOW-COST EDITOR FOR MPEG-1 SYSTEM STREAMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19950801), vol. 41, no. 3, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 620 - 625, XP000539515 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.468027 |