EP0858251 - Printed-circuit board-mountable ferrite EMI filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Galen L. 1736 Havard Street Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | 02 /
Yoon, Woong K. 7171 Berthoud Street Westminster, Colorado 80030 / US | 03 /
Norte, David A. 6969 W. 90th Avenue No. 933 Westminster, Colorado 80021 / US | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1998/33] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300555.4 | 27.01.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | US19970795431 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: US 795431 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858251 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858251 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H03H1/00, H01F17/00, H01F17/04 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H03H1/0007 (EP,US);
H01F17/0006 (EP,US);
H01F17/06 (EP,US);
H05K1/0233 (EP,US);
H01F2017/065 (EP,US);
H05K1/0237 (EP,US);
H05K1/165 (EP,US);
H05K1/182 (EP,US);
H05K2201/086 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ferrit-EMI-Filter zur Montage auf einer Leiterplatte | [1998/33] | English: | Printed-circuit board-mountable ferrite EMI filter | [1998/33] | French: | Filtre d'interférences électromagnétiques en ferrite pour le montage sur une plaque à circuit imprimé | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99104811.7 / EP0924969 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5025211 (CRAFT ADAM B [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5455552 (METSLER ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4636752 (SAITO YASUAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0169694 (RCA CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3830596 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0126169 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [PX]DE29715106U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-3 * figure -; claim - * |