EP0857894 - Sensing manual shift into automated upper ratios [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steeby, Jon A. 328 North Cedar Street Schoolcraft, MI 49087-9780 / US | 02 /
Janeke, Daniel P. 1222 Homecrest Avenue Kalamazoo, MI 49001-4323 / US | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Eaton B.V. P.O.Box 75777 1118 ZX Luchthaven Schiphol / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Eaton House, Staines Road Hounslow, Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300842.6 | 05.02.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | US19970796001 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: US 796001 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0857894 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0857894 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857894 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, B60K41/08, // F16H63:44 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/111 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
F16H61/702 (EP,US);
F16H63/44 (EP,US);
F16H59/24 (EP,US);
F16H59/40 (EP,US);
F16H59/44 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H61/0248 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/33] | F16H59/02, // F16H63/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Signalisierung von manuellem Schalten in einen höheren automatisierten Gangwechsel | [1998/33] | English: | Sensing manual shift into automated upper ratios | [1998/33] | French: | Détection d'un mode de changement de vitesse manuel en un mode automatique pour les rpports plus élevés | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0410593 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,9* figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0547829 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 37 - line 57; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5582558 (PALMERI FRANK A [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 10 * * column 12, line 19 - line 60; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19622665 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 30; figures 6,11A-12 *; | [PA]WO9705411 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [PA] 1,9 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 13; figure 2 * | by applicant | US3105395 | US3335616 | US3429202 | US3799002 | US4361060 | US4455883 | US4561325 | US4595986 | US4663725 | US4722248 | US4754665 | US4850236 | US4920815 | US4974468 | US5000060 | US5038027 | US5038627 | US5193410 | US5199314 | US5329826 | US5370013 | US5390561 | US5393276 | US5393277 | US5498195 | EP0742393 | US5682790 | US19970796006 | US19970795616 | US19970795615 | US19970790210 | US19970790209 | US19970793918 |