EP0861638 - Modular endoluminal stent-grafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORVITA CORPORATION 8210 N.W. 27th Street Miami Florida 33122 / US | [2005/37] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states CORVITA CORPORATION 8210 N.W. 27th Street Miami Florida 33122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinchuk, Leonard 9834 S.W. 111 Terrace Miami, Florida 33176 / US | 02 /
Dereume, Jean-Pierre 70 Boulevard de la Cambre 1000 Brussels / BE | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [1998/36] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301345.9 | 24.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | US19970806739 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: US 806739 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0861638 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0861638 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861638 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP);
A61F2/90 (EP);
A61F2/89 (EP);
A61F2002/075 (EP);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2220/005 (EP);
A61F2220/0058 (EP);
A61F2220/0075 (EP);
A61F2230/0067 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [1999/33] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI | ||
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modulares endoluminales Stent-Gewebe | [1998/36] | English: | Modular endoluminal stent-grafts | [1998/36] | French: | Stent-prothése endoluminale modulaire | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 12.05.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.07.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5064435 (PORTER CHRISTOPHER H [US]) [X] 1-3,6,11,12 * column W * [Y] 7-9; | [Y]WO9509586 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * page 10, line 9 - page 12, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4418336 (ANGIOMED AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0740928 (CORVITA EUROP [BE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 * | [A] - WILSON G J ET AL, "A SELF-EXPANDING BIFURCATED ENDOVASCULAR GRAFT FOR ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSM REPAIR", ASAIO JOURNAL, (199609), vol. 42, no. 5, pages M386 - M393, XP000683606 [A] 1 | by applicant | US4655771 | US4954126 | GB1205743 |