EP0861771 - Hydrofoil rowing boat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davis, Michael J. Old Bridge House, St Peter Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states Davis, Michael J. Old Bridge House, St Peter Street Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1NQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301453.1 | 27.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | GB19970004329 | 01.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9704329 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0861771 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0861771 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B63H16/02, B63B1/24 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
B63B1/28 (EP);
B63H16/02 (EP);
B63H2016/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/36] | B63B1/24, B63H16/02 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/14] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tragflächenruderboot | [1998/36] | English: | Hydrofoil rowing boat | [1998/36] | French: | Bateau à rames à aile portante | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/42] | 16.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2651022 (WIESER DR RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1,12,14 * figures 1,2; claims 22,23 * * page 10, line 17 - line 30 * * page 11, line 6 - line 10 *; | [AD]US4711195 (SHUTT SIDNEY G [US]) [AD] 1,2,12-14 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 45 *; | [A]WO8606343 (POHLUS GUENTHER) [A] 1-3,14 * abstract *; | [A]DE4041252 (BRAND BERND DIPL ING [DE], et al) [A] 4,7,14 * figure 14; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2756073 (WIESER DR RUDOLF) [A] 1,2,14 * figure 7A; claims 16-18,40 * * page 12, line 29 - line 34 * * page 13, line 4 - line 20 * * page 19, line 8 - line 10 *; | [A]US5362264 (PARANT PIERRE-LOUIS [CA]); | [A]US4349340 (HOFFMANN BENJAMIN) | [A] - EIJK DICK VAN, "Liever de lucht in met een waterfiets", NRC-HANDELSBLAD, ROTTERDAM NL, (19900721), page 13, XP002104615 [A] 1,2,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4711195 | US4867718 |