EP0862928 - Pacemaker with morphological filtering of sensed cardiac signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houben, Richard P.M. Blokbrekerstraat 12 6325 CT Berg En Terblijt / NL | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301556.1 | 03.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | US19970811053 | 04.03.1997 Original published format: US 811053 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0862928 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0862928 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862928 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/37, G06F17/00 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
A61N1/3704 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/37] | A61N1/37 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [2000/12] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Title | German: | Herzschrittmacher mit morphologischer Filterung von abgetasteten Herzsignalen | [1998/37] | English: | Pacemaker with morphological filtering of sensed cardiac signals | [1998/37] | French: | Stimulateur cardiaque à filtrage morphologique des signaux cardiaques mesurés | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 15.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Request for further processing for: | 02.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | [2005/21] |
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0506230 (VENTRITEX INC [US]) [A] 1,11-13,16,18,22 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 26 *; | [A]US4721114 (DUFAULT ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12,16,18,22 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 38 *; | [A]US5400795 (MURPHY ANTHONY J [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,16,18,22 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 52 *; | [A]US5513644 (MCCLURE KELLY H [US], et al) [A] 1,16,18,22 * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, line 11 - column 10, line 15 * | [A] - CHEE-HUNG HENRY CHU ET AL, "IMPULSIVE NOISE SUPPRESSION AND BACKGROUND NORMALIZATION OF ELECTROCARDIOGRAM SIGNALS USING MORPHOLOGICAL OPERATORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (19890201), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 262 - 273, XP000097075 [A] 1,3-5,7,16-18,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/10.16474 | [A] - TRAHANIAS P E, "AN APPROACH TO QRS COMPLEX DETECTION USING MATHEMATICAL MORPHOLOGY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (19930201), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 201 - 205, XP000380290 [A] 1,3,5-7,16-18,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/10.212060 |