EP0862937 - Temperature swing adsorption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalbassi, Mohammed Ali 6 Cromwell Close Walton-on-Thames, Surrey KT12 2AQ / GB | 02 /
Golden, Timothy Christopher 4104 Hampshire Court Allentown, PA 18104 / US | 03 /
Allam, Rodney John Westacre, 33 Guildown Road Guildford, Surrey GU2 5EU / GB | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301574.4 | 03.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | US19970812564 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: US 812564 | [1998/50] |
Former [1998/37] | US19970812564 | 06.03.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0862937 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0862937 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0862937 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862937 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01J20/10 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
F25J3/04169 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (KR);
B01D53/0407 (EP,US);
B01D53/0462 (EP,US);
F25J3/04157 (EP,US);
F25J3/04181 (EP,US);
F25J3/04775 (EP,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
F25J2205/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/37] | B01D53/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/29] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Temperaturwechseladsorption | [1998/37] | English: | Temperature swing adsorption | [1998/37] | French: | Adsorption à température alternée | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0549918 ; | [DA]US3557025 (EMERSON ROBERT B, et al) [DA] 1-27 * example 1 *; | [DA]US4433981 (SLAUGH LYNN H [US], et al) [DA] 1-27 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0379394 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 1-27 * page 3, line 50 - line 55; claims 1-13 *; | [DXA]US5137548 (GRENIER MAURICE [FR], et al) [DX] 1-3,24 * column 3, line 11 - line 14; claim 1 * [A] 4-23,25-27; | [A]WO9217428 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * claims 1,12,14-17 *; | [PA]EP0766991 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PA] 1-27* claims 1-12 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930706), vol. 017, no. 355, Database accession no. (C - 1079), & JP05049918 A 19930302 (KURARAY CHEM CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-27 * abstract * |