EP0863171 - Process for preparing polyethylene-2,6-naphthalene dicarboxylate resin. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/37] | Polyethylene-2,6-naphthalene dicarboxylate resin and preform and bottle molded thereof | ||
[2003/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kimihiko c/o Teijin Limited, 77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Minoru c/o Teijin Limited, 77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/37] | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301607.2 | 04.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | JP19970051636 | 06.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5163697 | JP19970103052 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10305297 | JP19970298482 | 30.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29848297 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863171 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863171 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/78, C08G63/189 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
C08G63/866 (EP,US);
C08G63/189 (EP,US);
C08G63/82 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyethylen-2,6-Naphthalendicarboxylat-Harz. | [2003/12] | English: | Process for preparing polyethylene-2,6-naphthalene dicarboxylate resin. | [2003/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation d' une résine de polyéthylène-2,6-naphtalène dicarboxylate. | [2003/12] |
Former [1998/37] | Polyethylen-2,6-Naphthalendicarboxylat-Harz und Vorform und geformte Flasche daraus | ||
Former [1998/37] | Polyethylene-2,6-naphthalene dicarboxylate resin and preform and bottle molded thereof | ||
Former [1998/37] | Résine de polyéthylène-2,6-naphtalène dicarboxylate et préformé et bouteille moulée à partir de celle-ci | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 24.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5294695 (LEE KWAN-HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-6 * claim - *; | [XY]EP0061414 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-6,13,14 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 29; claims 1-4 * [Y] 1,7-12; | [DY]JPH07258395 ; | [Y]JPH0892362 ; | [Y]JPH07109340 ; | [DA]JPH07258394 ; | [A]EP0630930 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-6,10-12 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07258395 A 19951009 (TEIJIN LTD) [DY] 1,7-12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, & JP08092362 A 19960409 (TEIJIN LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07109340 A 19950425 (TEIJIN LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07258394 A 19951009 (TEIJIN LTD) [DA] 1-6,10-14 * abstract * |