EP0883309 - Network-independent communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1998/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hjalmtysson, Gisli 61 Summit Avenue, Gillette New Jersey 07933 / US | 02 /
Jain, Ajay 27 Ashley Drive, Holmdel New Jersey 07733 / US | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301696.5 | 09.03.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | US19970848457 | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 848457 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0883309 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0883309 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
H04M7/0057 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US);
H04M2201/40 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5063 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04M3/567 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13095 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13096 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13199 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13248 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13337 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13374 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13383 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/48] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerk-unabhängiges Kommunikationssystem | [1998/50] | English: | Network-independent communications system | [1998/50] | French: | Système de communication indépendant de réseau | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 02.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9707625 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 15 * * page 12, line 9 - line 23 * * page 16, line 4 - line 15 * * page 19, line 12 - page 20, line 6 *; | [X]WO9706625 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 6 *; | [X]WO9211603 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - line 34 * * claims 1-5 * |