EP0864303 - Coated load bearing surface for a prosthetic joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Professional, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matthews, Frank D. 300 Winter Street Walpole, Massachusetts 02081 / US | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301709.6 | 09.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | US19970814265 | 10.03.1997 Original published format: US 814265 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0864303 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0864303 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864303 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36, A61F2/30, A61L27/00 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
A61F2/3609 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30107 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30217 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30474 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30485 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30574 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0009 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00011 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00203 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00239 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00407 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00413 (EP,US);
A61F2310/0052 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00544 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/08] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beschichtete lasttragende Fläche für ein Prothesengelenk | [1998/38] | English: | Coated load bearing surface for a prosthetic joint | [1998/38] | French: | Surface porteuse revêtue pour une articulation prothétique | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0597553 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 18 * abstract * * page 2, line 24 - line 28 * * page 2, line 46 - line 48 * * figure 6 * [A] 1,17 [Y] 19; | [Y]US5362311 (AMINO HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 45 - line 56 * * page 3, line 30 - line 35 * * page 5, line 1 - line 20 * * claims 1,2,4-6 * * figure 1A *; | [Y]US4697325 (KAMIGAITO OSAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17,19 * column 1, line 33 - line 39 * * column 1, line 53 - line 55 * * column 2, line 31 - line 32 * * column 2, line 47 - line 57 * * claim 1 * * figure *; | [A]US5181929 (PRATS CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 10,11,15 * page 2, line 30 - line 40 *; | [A]DE2548077 (FELDMUEHLE ANLAGEN PROD) [A] 13,14 * page 7, line 24 - line 30 * | [A] - FESSLER H ET AL, "FRICTION IN FEMORAL PROSTHESIS AND PHOTOELASTIC MODEL CONE TAPER JOINTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE. PART H, (1989), vol. 203, no. 1, pages 1 - 14, XP000008775 [A] 13,14 * the whole document * |