EP0867805 - Information processing apparatus for storing processing history data, method and program therefor as well as the computer readable medium storing the program. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/40] | Information processing apparatus for storing processing hystory data, and method therefor | ||
[2002/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakai, Masanori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takayama, Masayuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suda, Aruna Rohra Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Jeyachandran, Suresh Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301848.2 | 12.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | JP19970060852 | 14.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6085297 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867805 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867805 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US)
|
Former IPC [1998/40] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/23] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsgerät, -verfahren und computerlesbares Programm zum Speichern von Prozessverlaufdaten und computerlesbares Speichermedium zum Speichern des Programms. | [2002/45] | English: | Information processing apparatus for storing processing history data, method and program therefor as well as the computer readable medium storing the program. | [2002/45] | French: | Dispositif, procédé et programme de traitement d'information pour l'enregistrement de l'histoire d'un procédé ainsi que moyen de stockage de ce programme. | [2002/45] |
Former [1998/40] | Informationsverarbeitungsgerät und -verfahren zum Speichern von Prozessverlaufdaten | ||
Former [1998/40] | Information processing apparatus for storing processing hystory data, and method therefor | ||
Former [1998/40] | Dispositif et procédé de traitement d'information pour l'enregistrement de l'histoire d'un procédé | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 10.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Request for further processing for: | 25.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2003 | Decision despatched | 12.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2263988 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11-51,54-88 * page 3, line 4 - line 27 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 4 * * page 9, line 18 - line 34 * * page 37, line 1 - page 41, line 2 *; | [A]EP0621528 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-88 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 3 ** column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 7 * |