EP0910141 - Optically amplifying fiber and amplifier with such a fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inagaki, Shinya, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Shukunami, Norifumi Fujitsu Hokkaido D. T. Ltd., 2-1, Kita 1-jo Nishi Chuo-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0001 / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Keiko, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Okamura, Koji, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302226.0 | 24.03.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | JP19970285098 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28509897 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910141 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910141 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H04J14/02 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
H01S3/06708 (EP,US);
H01S3/0672 (EP,US);
H01S3/06729 (EP,US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2000/01] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisch verstärkende Faser und Verstärker mit einer solchen Faser | [1999/16] | English: | Optically amplifying fiber and amplifier with such a fiber | [1999/16] | French: | Fibre d'amplification optique et amplificateur comprenant une telle fibre | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9302492 (NKT RES CENTER AS [DK], et al); | [A]US5364429 (LE SERGENT CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [A]US5467218 (TAKEDA KEIKO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0762569 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2306763 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |