EP0869380 - Lens position control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasuya, Junichi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302281.5 | 25.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | JP19970098406 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 9840697 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0869380 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0869380 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869380 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, G02B7/10 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
G02B7/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/41] | G02B7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/16] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Positionierung einer Linse | [1998/41] | English: | Lens position control apparatus | [1998/41] | French: | Dispositif pour contrôler la position d'une lentille | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4861146 (HATASE TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8 * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 4; figure 1 *[A] 9; | [XA]EP0394901 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 7, line 37 - line 48 * * column 11, line 12 - line 32 * * column 12, line 12 - line 47 * * column 13, line 15 - line 49; figures 5,11 * [A] 9; | [XA]US5036348 (KUSAKA YOSUKE [JP]) [X] 1,4-8 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 24 - line 27 * * column 9, line 7 - line 61 * * column 10, line 1 - line 19 * * column 11, line 23 - column 12, line 11 * * figures 3,6,8A, * [A] 9 |