EP0875451 - Electronic throttle control system for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Edward, British Aerospace Defence Ltd. Military Aircraft Div., Warton Aerodrome Preston, Lancashire PR4 1AX / GB | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/42] |
Former [1998/45] | Eastmond, John, et al British Aerospace plc, Corporate IPR Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302370.6 | 27.03.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | GB19970006447 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9706447 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875451 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875451 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875451 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B64D31/02, B64C13/04, G05G5/03, G05D1/00 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B64C13/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | B64C13/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Flugzeugleistungskontrollhebelsystem | [1998/45] | English: | Electronic throttle control system for aircraft | [1998/45] | French: | Commande de puissance électronique pour aéronef | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2708112 (RATIER FIGEAC SOC [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,14-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 16 * * page 6, line 5 - line 31 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US5347204 (GREGORY WILLIAM W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,14-17 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 19 - column 4, line 60 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 9 * * column 5, line 27 - line 53 * * column 8, line 40 - line 55 * [A] 2; | [X]US5559415 (GREGORY WILLIAM W [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,14-17 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 42 - line 56 * * column 2, line 33 - line 66 *; | [XA]EP0659639 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 1,14-17 * abstract * * column 5, line 7 - line 26 * * figure 7 * [A] 9,10; | [XA]EP0483773 (SYSTEMS CONTROL TECH [US]) [X] 1,13-15,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - line 47 * * page 5, line 12 - page 9, line 25 * * figures 2,6 * [A] 8,16; | [X]EP0326439 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1,2,17 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 30 * * column 7, line 20 - line 28 * * figure 7 * | [X] - HEGG J W ET AL, "SIDESTICK CONTROLLERS FOR ADVANCED AIRCRAFT COCKPITS", SCIENTIFIC HONEYWELLER, (19930101), ISSN 0196-8440, pages 70 - 77, XP000429070 [X] 1-4,9,10,13-17 * page 71, column 3, line 2 - page 72, column 2, line 6 * * page 73, column 2, line 4 - page 74, column 2, line 25 * * page 74, column 3, line 32 - page 75, column 2, line 10 * * figures 3,9 * |