EP0923934 - Modified release matrix formulation of cefaclor and cephalexin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD. 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arora, Jagdish 1006, Sector 37-B Chandigarh - 160023 / IN | 02 /
Jain, Girish 4, Sharda Niketan, Teacher's Colony Pitampura, Delhi - 110 034 / IN | 03 /
Sen, Himadri D-1/25, Qutab Enclave - 1, DLF, Gurgaon Haryana - 122 001 / IN | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al Moinas Savoye & Cronin 42 rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1999/25] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302445.6 | 30.03.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | US19970992151 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: US 992151 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923934 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923934 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/545, A61K9/22, A61K47/38 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/545 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zubereitung enthaltend Cefaclor oder Cephalexin mit modifizierter Freisetzungsmatrix | [1999/25] | English: | Modified release matrix formulation of cefaclor and cephalexin | [1999/25] | French: | Formulation contenant du cefaclore ou du céphalexin à matrice avec libération modifiée | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1998 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4695467 (UEMURA TOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* see examples 4,5,7,8 *; | [XD]US4968508 (OREN PETER L [US], et al) [XD] 1-10,12-17 *see in particular the examples 3,4,11; claim 5; *; | [X]WO9731639 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12,15,16; | [E]EP0890359 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-10,12,15,16 * see claims 1,2; examples 1 & 6; and page 3, lines 22-24 * |