EP0947234 - A single-stage and dry catalytic process for the simultaneous removal of sulfur dioxide and nitrogen oxides from gas streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hong Kong University of Science & Technology Clear Water Bay Kowloon / HK | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fang, Ming The Hong Kong University of Science & Technology Clearwater Bay, Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
Ma, Jian Xin Apt. 106, 2nd Floor, 1733 Huaihai Zhong Road Shanghai / CN | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302505.7 | 31.03.1998 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947234 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947234 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, B01J27/04, B01J27/053 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
B01D53/8637 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2000/27] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einstufiges und trocken katalytisches Verfahren zur simultanen Entfernung von Schwefeldioxid und Stickstoffoxiden aus Gasstromen | [1999/40] | English: | A single-stage and dry catalytic process for the simultaneous removal of sulfur dioxide and nitrogen oxides from gas streams | [1999/40] | French: | Procédé catalytique sec à une étape pour la séparation simultanée de dioxyde de soufre et d'oxydes d'azote de courant gazeux | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.11.2004 | DE | 11.02.2005 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0276883 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [A] 1,24* claim - *; | [X]US5002752 (LEE ANTHONY L [US], et al) [X] 24 * claim - * |