EP0869178 - SAF-3, Sialoadhesin family member-3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikly, Kristine Kay SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Erickson-Miller, Connie Lynn SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302527.1 | 01.04.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | US19970041885P | 02.04.1997 Original published format: US 41885 P | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0869178 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K48/00 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/24] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SAF-3, ein Mitglied der Sialoadhesin-Familie | [1998/41] | English: | SAF-3, Sialoadhesin family member-3 | [1998/41] | French: | SAF-3, un membre de la famille des sialoadhésines | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/04] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/04] | Request for further processing for: | 29.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "EST70319 from Stratagene placenta", GENBANK, (19950208), XP002066898 [X] 1-3,8-10,13,14 * the whole document * | [A] - KELM S. ET AL., "The Sialoadhesins: a family of sialic acid-dependent cellular recognition molecules within the immunoglobulin superfamily", GLYCOCONJ. J., (199612), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 913 - 926, XP002066896 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01053186 | [A] - ZANNETTINO A.C.W. ET AL., "A powerful technique for isolating genes encoding surface antigens using retroviral expression cloning", J. IMMUNOL., (19960115), vol. 156, no. 2, pages 611 - 620, XP002066893 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [AD] - ADAMS M D ET AL, "COMPLEMENTARY DNA SEQUENCING: EXPRESSED SEQUENCE TAGS AND HUMAN GENOME PROJECT", SCIENCE, (19910621), vol. 252, no. 5013, pages 1651 - 1656, XP000645049 [AD] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2047873 | [AD] - SIMMONS D. & SEED B., "Isolation of a cDNA encoding CD33, a differentiation antigen of myeloid progenitor cells", J. IMMUNOLOGY, (19881015), vol. 141, no. 8, pages 2797 - 2800, XP002066894 [AD] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 4 * | [A] - CROCKER P.R. ET AL., "Sialoadhesin, a macrophage sialic acid binding receptor for haemopoietic cells with 17 immunoglobulin-like domains", EMBO J., (19941003), vol. 13, no. 19, pages 4490 - 4503, XP002066895 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [AD] - PATEL N. ET AL., "OB binding protein - 1", GENBANK, (19961112), XP002066901 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PX] - "EST50650, H. sapiens cDNA similar to CD33 antigen", GENBANK, (19970421), XP002066900 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PA] - TAKEI Y. ET AL., "Molecular cloning of a novel gene similar to myeloid antigen CD33 and its specific expression in placenta", CYTOGENET. CELL GENET., (1997), vol. 78, pages 295 - 300, XP002066897 [PA] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * |