EP0872204 - Shower tray arrangement for disabled persons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cundick, Terence Luther 1 Mill Cottage Bransford Worcester WR6 5JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Cundick, Terence Luther 1 Mill Cottage Bransford, Worcester WR6 5JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles, et al Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Jackson, Derek Charles, et al Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Jackson, Derek Charles, et al Derek Jackson Associates, The Old Yard, Lower Town Claines, Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [1998/43] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Haven Plough Road Tibberton Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302580.0 | 01.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | GB19970007713 | 16.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9707713 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0872204 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0872204 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/22 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
A47K3/405 (EP);
A47K3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FI, FR, IE, NL, SE [2000/15] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Duschwanne für behinderte Personen | [1998/43] | English: | Shower tray arrangement for disabled persons | [1998/43] | French: | Bac de douche pour personnes handicappées | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5243716 (ZACCAI GIANFRANCO D [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-11 *; | [AD]GB2244428 (DALEMAR LTD [GB], et al) | by applicant | GB2244428 |