EP0871134 - Accessing database information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Informix Software, Inc. 4100 Bohannon Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ubell, Michael 5469 Kales Avenue Oakland, California 94618 / US | 02 /
Kelleman, Keith 2867 SE Brooklyn Street Portland, Oregon 97202 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/42] | Lunt, Mark George Francis Dibb Lupton Alsop Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302837.4 | 14.04.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | US19970835967 | 11.04.1997 Original published format: US 835967 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0871134 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0871134 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871134 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F9/46 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
G06F16/2308 (EP,US);
G06F16/25 (EP,US);
G06F16/2291 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/39] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zugriff auf Datenbankinformation | [1998/42] | English: | Accessing database information | [1998/42] | French: | Méthode d'accés aux informations d'une base de données | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.09.2003 | SE | 17.12.2003 | ES | 28.12.2003 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/16] | NL | 17.09.2003 | |
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 17.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4809160 (MAHON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 61 *; | [A]EP0558945 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5412717 (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 41 *; | [A]US5511192 (SHIRAKIHARA TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 1, line 10 - column 4, line 25 *; | [Y]US5572673 (SHURTS SCOTT A [US]) [Y] 1,2,19-22 * the whole document *; | [YA]US5590326 (MANABE TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,19-22 * the whole document * [A] 6-12 |