EP0875261 - Catheter and needle assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Industries Public Limited Company 765, Finchley Road London, NW11 8DS / GB | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donnan, Jerry 29 Sherrifs Park Linlithgow, West Lothian, EH49 7SR / GB | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Flint, Jonathan McNeill, et al Smiths Group plc and Subsidiary Companies 765 Finchley Road London NW11 8DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Flint, Jonathan McNeill, et al SMITHS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 765 Finchley Road London NW11 8DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302848.1 | 14.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | GB19970008569 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9708569 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875261 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875261 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/06 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
A61M25/0631 (EP,US);
A61M5/322 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/18] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nadel- und Kathetervorrichtungen | [1998/45] | English: | Catheter and needle assemblies | [1998/45] | French: | Ensembles d'aiguille et cathéter | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 01.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/16] | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0799626 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [PX] 1,2,6,7 * page 3, column 4, line 21 - page 4, column 6, line 16; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP0747083 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract *; | [X]GB2292525 (STERIMATIC HOLDINGS LTD [VG]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 6, line 13 - page 10, line 12; figures 1-7A *; | [X]US5300045 (PLASSCHE JR WALTER M [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [X]EP0545671 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [X] 1,9 * page 4, column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 36; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US4944725 (MCDONALD MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-12 * * column 4, line 6 - line 52 *; | [A]EP0750917 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |