EP0875444 - Quick release derailleur [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-77 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590-77 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichida, Tadashi 3-4-2-208, Shinkanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303120.4 | 23.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | US19970847073 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: US 847073 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875444 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875444 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/12 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B62M9/125 (EP,US);
B62K25/02 (EP,US);
B62M9/1246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnell lösbare Kettenschaltung | [1998/45] | English: | Quick release derailleur | [1998/45] | French: | Dérailleur démontable rapide | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 05.05.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0585472 (MAEDA IND [JP])[A] 1,6,12; | [A]EP0655386 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,12 |