EP0875663 - Roof bolt with a visual length indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07675 / US | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlsen, Terje 12381 SE 126th Avenue Portland, Oregon 97236 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303203.8 | 24.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | US19970045448P | 02.05.1997 Original published format: US 45448 P | US19970961904 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: US 961904 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875663 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E21D21/00, E21F17/18, G01B5/18, G01B3/28 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
G01B5/18 (EP,US);
E21D21/0093 (EP,US);
E21F17/18 (EP,US);
G01B3/28 (EP,US);
Y10S411/923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gebirgsanker mit einem visuellen Längeanzeiger | [1998/45] | English: | Roof bolt with a visual length indicator | [1998/45] | French: | Boulon d'ancrage avec un indicateur visuel de la longueur | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 04.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3831282 (FALK M); | [A]US4126004 (LINDEBOOM HERMAN); | [A]GB2253707 (COAL IND [GB]); | [A] - A.J.BARRY EL ALL, "anchorage testing of mine-roof bolts. part 2.", BUREAU OF MINES.REPORT OF INVESTIGATIONS, USA, (195602), XP002068731 [A] 1-4 * page 8; figure 5 * | [A] - "how to check bolting procedures", COAL AGE, (195609), vol. 61, no. 9, page 92, XP002068732 [A] 1-4 * page 92; figure - * |