EP0874415 - High-frequency package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2006/32] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 5-22, Kita inoue-cho, Higashino Yamashina-ku, Kyoto 607 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koriyama, Shinichi c/o Kyocera Corporation, 1-4 Yamashita-cho Kokubu-shi, Kagoshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Mikio c/o Kyocera Corporation, 1-4 Yamashita-cho Kokubu-shi, Kagoshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Kitazawa, Kenji c/o Kyocera Corporation, 1-4 Yamashita-cho Kokubu-shi, Kagoshima-ken / JP | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303224.4 | 27.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | JP19970108726 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10872697 | JP19970108727 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10872797 | JP19970108728 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10872897 | JP19970108729 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10872997 | JP19970266312 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26631297 | JP19970300926 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: JP 30092697 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0874415 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0874415 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874415 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/107, H01L23/66 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
H01P5/107 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6627 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6633 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01021 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1532 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16195 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1903 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19039 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, NL, SE [1999/38] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzbaugruppe | [2006/15] | English: | High-frequency package | [1998/44] | French: | Module à haute fréquence | [2006/15] |
Former [1998/44] | Hochfrequenzpackung | ||
Former [1998/44] | Empaquetage à haute fréquence | Examination procedure | 07.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5949003 ; | [X]US3683241 (DUNCAN DAVID M) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3924204 (FACHE MICHEL, et al) [A] 3 * column 2, line 39 - line 46 * * column 3, line 18 - line 23 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US4453142 (MURPHY EARL R [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11,13,14 * column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 4 * * column 1, line 23 - line 27 * * column 2, line 15 - line 19 * * column 4, line 35 - line 39 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP0599316 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 15-17 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 7 - line 17 * * figure 1 * * column 3, line 44 - line 48 * [A] 26; | [X]US5396202 (SCHECK HANS-OTTO [DE]) [X] 15,18,19 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US5414394 (GAMAND PATRICE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [X]WO9627913 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [X] 15-17,20-22 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 2; figure 1 *; | [PXA]WO9744851 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [PX] 15,18-24 * page 3, line 23 - page 6, line 31; figure 3 * [PA] 26-33 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840628), vol. 008, no. 139, Database accession no. (E - 253), & JP59049003 A 19840321 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 15-33 * abstract * | Examination | EP0597433 |