EP0875301 - Methods and devices for controlling the vibration of ultrasonic transmission components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Estabrook, Brian 24 West Street Foxboro, Massachusetts 02035 / US | 02 /
Kellogg, Scott P.O. Box 17243 Esmond, Rhode Island 02917 / US | 03 /
Alam, Stephen J. No. 1 Sagebrush Drive North Attleboro, Massachusetts 02760 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303246.7 | 27.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | US19970848064 | 28.04.1997 Original published format: US 848064 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875301 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875301 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, B06B1/02 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,US);
B06B1/0276 (EP,US);
B06B1/0611 (EP,US);
B06B1/0614 (EP,US);
B06B1/0618 (EP,US);
B06B1/0622 (EP,US);
G10K11/02 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00132 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320069 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320071 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320089 (EP,US);
B06B2201/76 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | B06B1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/24] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Regelung der Vibrationen von Ultraschall-Übertragungskomponenten | [1998/45] | English: | Methods and devices for controlling the vibration of ultrasonic transmission components | [1998/45] | French: | Méthode et dispositifs pour contrôler les vibrations de composants de transmission à ultrasons | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 01.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/22] | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3826414 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 33 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 23 * * column 11, line 4 - column 12, line 9 * * figures 15-18; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0765637 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 7 - line 47 * * column 11, line 1 - line 29 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5180363 (IDEMOTO MORITO [JP], et al) [A] 14-20 * column 4, line 66 - column 6, line 22 * * figure 21 *; | [A]US4888565 (LITTLEFORD GORDON E [GB], et al) [A] 14-20 * column 3, line 1 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]US5425704 (SAKURAI TOMOHISA [JP], et al) [A] 17 * column 6, line 6 - line 24 * |