EP0878427 - Sheet output unit for a printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 New Circle Road N.W. Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 New Circle Road N.W. Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baskette, Michael Wesley 922 Mason-Headley Road Lexington, Kentucky 40504 / US | 02 /
Chappel, Billy Carl 1425 Green Leaf Court Road Mount Sterling, Kentucky 40353 / US | 03 /
Horrall, Paul Douglas 621 South Broadway, Georgetown Lexington, Kentucky 40324 / US | 04 /
Kennedy, Michael Earl 3751 Appian Way No. 289 Road Lexington, Kentucky 40517 / US | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [1998/47] | Application number, filing date | 98303715.1 | 12.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | US19970854318 | 12.05.1997 Original published format: US 854318 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878427 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878427 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878427 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/11, B65H31/22, B41J13/10, B65H29/60 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
B65H31/22 (EP,US);
B65H29/60 (EP,US);
B65H2801/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | B65H39/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/49] |
Former [2000/02] | FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bogenausgabestation für einen Drucker | [1998/47] | English: | Sheet output unit for a printer | [1998/47] | French: | Unité de sortie de feuilles pour une imprimante | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 22.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB363214 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]FR2559466 (KIENZLE APPARATE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0200240 (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 29 - line 55; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0225240 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 26; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0598125 (ACE DENKEN KK [JP]); | [A] - D.W. TATES, "UPHILL STACKING SORTER", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL., STAMFORD, CONN US, (197604), vol. 1, no. 4, page 63, XP002093866 |