EP0878168 - Electrosurgical hemostatic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | Change - withdrawal | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yates, David C. 7534 Galway Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
Voegele, James W. 11486 Kemperknoll Cincinnati, Ohio 45249 / US | 03 /
Kuhns, Jesse 3619 Michigan Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | 04 /
Nalagatla, Anil 341C Shawnee Run West Carrollton, Ohio 45449 / US | 05 /
Williamson, Warren P. 101 Southbend Court Loveland, Ohio 45150 / US | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303753.2 | 13.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | US19970856520 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: US 856520 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0878168 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/39, A61B17/072 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1447 (EP,US);
A61B17/32 (EP,US);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2090/032 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/30] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrochirurgische, blutstillende Vorrichtung | [1998/47] | English: | Electrosurgical hemostatic device | [1998/47] | French: | Instrument d'hémostase électrochirurgicale | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 02.11.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/01] | 04.11.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3898992 (BALAMUTH LEWIS) [A] 1* column 15, line 7 - line 21 *; | [X]US5389098 (TSURUTA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 38, line 48 - line 53 *; | [DX]US5403312 (YATES DAVID C [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * figures 1-21 * * column 11, line 10 - line 13 *; | [X]EP0717960 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 28 - line 34 *; | [X]EP0737446 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 7 * | by applicant | US4608981 | US4633874 | US5104025 | US5403312 | US5597107 | - VAELLFORS, BERTIL AND BERGDAHL, BJOERN, "Automatically controlled Bipolar Electrocoagulation", NEUROSURG. REV., (1984), pages 187 - 190 | US19920917636 |