EP0878605 - Use of corrosion inhibited organic acid compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brezinski, Michael M. Van Alkemadalaan 52 2597 AN The Hague / NL | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303756.5 | 13.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | US19970855083 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: US 855083 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878605 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878605 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878605 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/22, E21B41/02, C23F11/04 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
C23F11/141 (EP,US);
C09K8/54 (EP,US);
C23F11/04 (EP,US);
Y10S507/934 (EP,US);
Y10S507/939 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | E21B43/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/04] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einsatz von korrosionsverhindernden organischen Säurezusammensetzungen | [1998/47] | English: | Use of corrosion inhibited organic acid compositions | [1998/47] | French: | Usage des compositions des acides organiques inhibiteur à la corrosion | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1780594 (LAWRENCE RALPH E) [A] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 16 * * page 1, line 58 *; | [A]GB1108590 (COWLES CHEM CO) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US4498997 (WALKER MICHAEL L [US]) [DA] 1-8 * column 2, line 39 - line 48 * * column 3, line 3 - line 11 *; | [A]US4871024 (CIZEK ARTHUR [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 6; example B; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP0534621 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] * page 3, line 40 - line 52 *; | [PA]US5697443 (BREZINSKI MICHAEL M [US], et al) [PA] 1-8 * column 3, line 3 - line 5 * * column 3, line 16 - line 41; claim 6 * |