EP0960907 - Flame-retardant thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 305 Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0113 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Kyowa Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 305 Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0113 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imahashi, Takeshi Kyowa Chemical Ind. Co., Ltd., 4285, Hayashida-cho Sakaide-shi, Kagawa 762-0012 / JP | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304104.7 | 22.05.1998 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960907 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960907 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02, C08L101/00, C08L23/00, C08L25/00, C08L77/00, // (C08K13/02, 3:22, 3:22, 5:02),(C08L101/00, 83:04) | [1999/48] | CPC: |
C08K3/38 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/2279 (EP,US);
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08L25/00 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2217 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/00, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flammhemmende, thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung | [1999/48] | English: | Flame-retardant thermoplastic resin composition | [1999/48] | French: | Compositions de résine thermoplastique ignifuge | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 02.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0273838 ; | [A]US4373048 (SCHUBERT PAUL C, et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]GB2163167 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0536423 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0763565 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1* example -; claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 17, Database accession no. 90-127071, XP002079910 & JPH0273838 A 19900313 (KURABE KK) [X] 1-15 * abstract * |