EP0882793 - A human 7-tm receptor similar to murine frizzled-6 gene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Erding SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Zhu, Yuan SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304208.6 | 28.05.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | US19970048240P | 02.06.1997 Original published format: US 48240 P | US19970987289 | 09.12.1997 Original published format: US 987289 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0882793 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0882793 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/85, C12N15/11, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K38/17, A61K48/00, G01N33/50 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/04] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein menschlicher 7-tm Rezeptor, der dem murinen frizzled-6 Gen ähnelt | [2000/21] | English: | A human 7-tm receptor similar to murine frizzled-6 gene | [1998/50] | French: | Recepteur 7-tm humain ressemblant au gene murin frizzled-6 | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/50] | Ein menschlicher 7-TM Rezeptor, der dem Murinen Frizzled-6 Gen ähnelt | ||
Former [1998/50] | Récepteur 7-TM humain ressemblant au gène murin frizzled-6 | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]WO9739357 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [T] 1-20 * the whole document * | [XD] - WANG Y ET AL, "A LARGE FAMILY OF PUTATIVE TRANSMEMBRANE RECEPTORS HOMOLOGOUS TO THE PRODUCT OF THE DROSOPHILA TISSUE POLARITY GENE FRIZZLED", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19960223), vol. 271, no. 8, pages 4468 - 4476, XP002054778 [XD] 1,3,5-7,10,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.8.4468 | [ ] - "AC U43319", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19960113) [ ] * the whole document * | [X] - HOANG B ET AL, "PRIMARY STRUCTURE AND TISSUE DISTRIBUTION OF FRZB, A NOVEL PROTEIN RELATED TO DROSOPHILA FRIZZLED, SUGGEST A ROLE IN SKELETAL MORPHOGENESIS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19961018), vol. 271, no. 42, pages 26131 - 26137, XP002054777 [X] 17,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.42.26131 | [A] - HILLIER L. ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project, AC AA064897", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19960926), XP002074749 [A] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document * | [A] - ADAMS M. ET AL., "AC AA385032", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19970418), XP002074750 [A] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document * | [A] - WANG Y K ET AL, "A novel human homologue of the Drosophila frizzled wnt receptor gene binds wingless protein and is in the Williams syndrome deletion at 7q11.23.", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (1997 MAR) 6 (3) 465-72. JOURNAL CODE: BRC. ISSN: 0964-6906., XP002074751 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - HE X ET AL, "A member of the Frizzled protein family mediating axis induction by Wnt-5A.", SCIENCE, (1997 MAR 14) 275 (5306) 1652-4. JOURNAL CODE: UJ7. ISSN: 0036-8075., XP002074752 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - TOKUHARA M ET AL, "Molecular cloning of human Frizzled-6.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1998 FEB 13) 243 (2) 622-7. JOURNAL CODE: 9Y8. ISSN: 0006-291X., XP002074753 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * |