EP0902308 - Optical fiber grating and manufacturing method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamauchi, Ryozo 2-3-11, Miyamae Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Wada, Akira 121-1-610, Tamachi Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Tetsuya 1-3-1-706, Miyanodai Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Nobuyuki C-605, Matsugaoka-ryo, 188-4, Jo Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Shima, Kensuke B-202 188-33 Jo., Sakura-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Nishide, Kenji 1602, 981-1, Kaburagi-cho Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 07 /
Yamasaki, Shigefumi 4-17-10, Miyanodai Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304293.8 | 01.06.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | JP19970247292 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: JP 24729297 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902308 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902308 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, H04B10/00 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/02147 (EP,US);
G02B6/02095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/11] | G02B6/16, H04B10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Faser-Gitter und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [1999/11] | English: | Optical fiber grating and manufacturing method therefor | [1999/11] | French: | Réseau à fibre optique et procédé de sa fabrication | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0572169 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,7,11,12* the whole document *; | [A]US5411566 (POOLE CRAIG D [US], et al) [A] 1,4-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0736784 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,4-7,9,10 * figure - * * column 6, line 1 - line 53 * * column 5, line 1 - line 59 * * column 4, line 15 - line 59 * * column 1, line 3 - line 13 *; | [XP] - M.AKIYAMA ET.AL., "A novel long-period fiber grating using periodically released residual stress of pure-silica core fiber", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT 1998.OFC'98., TECHNICAL DIGEST, wASHINGTON, DC,USA, (19980222), vol. 2, pages 276 - 277, XP002087780 [XP] 1-5,7-9,11 * the whole document * | [A] - C.NARAYANAN ET.AL., "Band-rejection fiber filter using periodic core deformation", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION, (19960225), vol. 2, pages 267 - 269, XP002087781 [A] 1,4-7,9,10 * the whole document * | [A] - VENGSARKAR A M, "LONG-PERIOD FIBER GRATINGS SHAPE OPTICAL SPECTRA", LASER FOCUS WORLD, (199606), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 243 - 246, 248, XP002054623 [A] 1,4,7,9,11,12 * the whole document * | Examination | US5430817 | - YAMAUCHI R. ET AL, "Direct observation of drawing-induced anisotropic refractive-index change in quasifibers by a polarization preform analyzer", OSA TECHNICAL DIGEST SERIES, (1989), vol. 5, page THL03, XP009023488 |