EP0890897 - Print data generation system and corresponding method for use with a printing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiohara, Susumu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304516.2 | 08.06.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | JP19970151412 | 09.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15141297 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890897 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890897 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890897 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/1206 (EP);
G06F3/1296 (US);
G06F3/1225 (EP);
G06F3/1285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/01] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckdatenerzeugungssystem und entsprechendes Verfahren, um in einem Druckersystem zu verwenden | [1999/02] | English: | Print data generation system and corresponding method for use with a printing system | [1999/02] | French: | Système de génération de données d'impression et méthode correspondant pour l'utilisation avec un système d'imprimante | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5559933 (BOSWELL R STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-13 * figures 7,13,14,18,19,21-23,33 * * column 12, line 44 - column 16, line 29 * * column 17, line 48 - column 18, line 26 * * column 20, line 48 - column 21, line 46 * * column 21, line 66 - column 22, line 39 * * column 22, line 58 - column 24, line 18 * * column 26, line 66 - column 27, line 18 *; | [A]EP0521673 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-8,10-13 * the whole document * |