EP0888025 - Method and apparatus for providing partitioned telecommunication service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Intellectual Property II, L.P. 645 East Plum Lane Reno, NV 89502 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amin, Umesh J. 10522 180 Court N.E. Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304671.5 | 12.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970882804 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 882804 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888025 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0888025 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888025 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/02, H04W48/18, H04W84/14 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (EP,US);
H04W84/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H04W48/18 | ||
Former IPC [2000/01] | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22, H04Q7/20 | ||
Former IPC [1999/01] | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/37] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Versorgung mit geteilten Telekommunikationsdiensten | [1999/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing partitioned telecommunication service | [1999/01] | French: | Méthode et appareil fournissant des services de télécommunication partagées | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | [2014/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5371782 (CASEY III WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * column 7, line 60 - column 11, line 21 * [A] 8,12,14,15,18,22,24; | [E]US5884157 (KARMI GADI [US]) [E] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12,14-16,18-20,22,24 * column 2, line 40 - line 53 * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 47 * |