EP0963764 - Self-retaining catheter and inserting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piolax Inc. 51, Iwai-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states Piolax Inc. 51, Iwai-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouri, Makoto 3-1, Ebisu Nishi 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Nobuhiko c/o PIOLAX INC., 51, Iwai-cho, Hodogawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kurebayashi, Yukihisa c/o PIOLAX INC., 51, Iwai-cho, Hodogawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [2009/48] |
Former [1999/50] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304684.8 | 12.06.1998 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963764 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/04 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
A61M25/0068 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0293 (EP,US);
A61M25/0041 (EP,US);
A61M25/008 (EP,US);
A61M25/0082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selbstsichernder Katheter und Einführungsvorrichtung | [1999/50] | English: | Self-retaining catheter and inserting device | [1999/50] | French: | Cathéter se maintenant seul en place et dispositif pour son introduction | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5709874 (HANSON STEPHEN R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * column A * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 9 * * column 5, line 5 - line 15 * * column 6, line 6 - line 24 * * column 11, line 18 - line 54; figures 1-5 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]EP0513991 (BARD INC C R [US]) [Y] 4,5 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0244818 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * column A; figures 2-4 *; | [XA]US5730741 (HORZEWSKI MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column A * * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 27 * * column 9, line 1 - line 13; figures 1,4,5,8 * [A] 4-9; | [A]US5554114 (WALLACE GEORGE B [US], et al); | [A]FR2661603 (CORALINES ABJ DIVISION SARL [FR]) | by applicant | JPH05192389 |