EP0885629 - Light pulse generating apparatus and cosmetic and therapeutic phototreatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellipse A/S Agern Allé 11 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Ellipse A/S Agern Allé 11 2970 Hoersholm / DK | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Danish Dermatologic Development A/S Dr. Neergaards Vej 5F 2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christiansen, Kare Violvej 16 2820 Gentofte / DK | 02 /
Hansen, Hugin Boelsvang 19 2970 Horsholm / DK | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [1998/52] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304722.6 | 15.06.1998 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | DK19970000703 | 16.06.1997 Original published format: DK 70397 | GB19970024775 | 24.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9724775 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0885629 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0885629 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00172 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00458 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/52] | Extension states | LT | 19.01.2000 | LV | 19.01.2000 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von pulsiertem Licht und kosmetische und therapeutische Photobehandlung | [1998/52] | English: | Light pulse generating apparatus and cosmetic and therapeutic phototreatment | [1998/52] | French: | Dispositif de génération d'impulsions lumineuses et de phototraitement cosmétique et thérapeutique | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 03.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/31] | 07.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.05.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/31] | Appeal following examination | 25.08.2010 | Appeal received No. T2207/10 | 25.10.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.05.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 09.07.2003 | Appeal received No. T0988/03 | 29.08.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.09.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 03.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE911525 (QUARZLAMPEN GMBH) [X] 6-9,27 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4; | [XY]DE692907 (PHIL DR MED FRIEDRICH LOENNE D) [X] 6-9,27 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,4,27; | [DY]EP0565331 (ESC INC [US]) [DY] 1,2,4,27 * abstract * * column 5, line 33 - line 51 *; | [XA]EP0485864 (MAXS AG [CH]) [X] 6,27 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 3, line 37 - line 42 * * column 4, line 43 * * column 5, line 11 * [A] 1,7; | [X]DE3803763 (VUGHT BARBARA VAN [DE]) [X] 10,12,27 * column 1, line 12 - line 66 * * column 2, line 14 - line 48; claims 2,3 * | by applicant | WO9115264 | EP0565331 | EP0736308 | - "conc. the production of singlet excited oxygen", CHEMISTRY IN BRITAIN, (199805), pages 45 - 50 |