EP0890750 - Fastener with a seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states EMHART LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seng, Hans Peter Steingasse 5 35447 Reiskirchen/Bersrod / DE | 02 /
Reindl, Johann Hohlgarten 33 35444 Biebertal-Fellingshausen / DE | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [1999/02] | Stagg, Diana Christine, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304735.8 | 16.06.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | DE1997211112U | 25.06.1997 Original published format: DE 29711112 U | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890750 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890750 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890750 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/06, B60R13/02, B60N3/04, F16B33/00, F16B37/04 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
F16B37/043 (EP);
B60N3/046 (EP);
B60R13/0206 (EP);
F16B33/004 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/02] | F16B5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abdichtendes Befestigungselement | [1999/02] | English: | Fastener with a seal | [1999/02] | French: | Elément de fixation comprenant un joint d'étanchéité | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2561726 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 14 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,6,8,9 *; | [A]FR2670253 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * abstract * * figures 7-9 *; | [A]US5419606 (HULL EDWARD I [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 2 *; | [A]DE19532360 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,7,9,12 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * |