EP0892410 - Improved thick film resistor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welwyn Components Limited Welwyn Electronics Park Bedlington Northumberland NE22 7AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Welwyn Components Limited Welwyn Electronics Park Bedlington, Northumberland NE22 7AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, Thomas M. c/o Welwyn Components Ltd., Welwyn Elec. Park Bedlington, Northumberland NE22 7AA / GB | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Shaya, Darrin Maurice Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Shaya, Darrin Maurice Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304740.8 | 16.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | US19970879270 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: US 879270 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0892410 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0892410 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/00, H01C17/065, B60H1/00, H01C1/084 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H01C17/06586 (EP,US);
H01C1/084 (EP,US);
H01C17/065 (EP,US);
H01C7/003 (EP,US);
H05K1/053 (EP,US);
H05K1/167 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/03] | H01C7/00, H01C17/065, B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserte Dickschichtwiderstandsanordnung | [1999/03] | English: | Improved thick film resistor assembly | [1999/03] | French: | Assemblage amélioré de résistance à film épais | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2202382 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 1,9,14,15,19 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 17; figures 1-3; claims 1,2,8-10 * [A] 16; | [DYA]US5181313 (NONNENMACHER RONALD C [US], et al) [DY] 1,9,14,15,19 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,10,11,16,18,20; | [DYA]US3895272 (SMOLKO GENNADY GRIGORIEVICH, et al) [DY] 1,9,14,15,19 * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 51; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 12,13; | [DA]US5408575 (MORRIS THOMAS M [US]) [DA] 1,8,12-15,18,19 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4404237 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 | by applicant | US5000662 | US5192940 | US5274351 | US5291174 | US5408575 | US4935717 | US5119063 | US5181313 | US2179566 | US3895272 | US4119937 | US4138636 | US4404237 | US4912306 | US5035836 | US5038132 | - tool and manufacturing engineers handbook, society of manufacturing engineers, 3rd edition, (1976), pages 25 - 44 | - general motors part no. 1995318 |