EP0965575 - Novel fragrance compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | Humphries, Martyn, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 90 Wilton, Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304816.6 | 18.06.1998 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965575 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/547, C07C47/43, C07C49/557, C07C45/29, C11B9/00, A61K7/46 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
C11B9/0038 (EP,US);
C07C45/292 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C45/516 (EP,US);
C07C45/58 (EP,US);
C07C47/43 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/292, C07C49/547 (EP,US);
C07C45/292, C07C49/557 (US,EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/43 (US,EP);
C07C45/516, C07C47/43 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Riechstoffe | [1999/51] | English: | Novel fragrance compounds | [1999/51] | French: | Agents parfumants | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1579952 (INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC.) [A] 1-3,5-8 * page 13 - page 14; claim - *; | [A] - ZAKHARKIN L I ET AL, "Simple synthesis of acetyl- and propionylcyclododecanes", RUSSIAN CHEMICAL BULLETIN, Russ. Acad. Sci.;A. N. Nesmeyanov Inst. Organoelement Compd.; Moscow; 117813; Russia (RU), (1993), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 382 - 383, XP002085020 [A] 1,4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00697104 |