EP0887977 - Generation of addresses for a coefficient memory in an equaliser for multicarrier signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-gu Seoul 100-095 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-gu Seoul 100-095 / KR | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro Jung-Gu, Seoul 100-095 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yong-Sang Ra-304, WanSung Villa, MyunMok 8-Dong, JungRang-Ku Seoul 131-208 / KR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Neobard, William John, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304967.7 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | KR19970027635 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: KR 9727635 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887977 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887977 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | [2003/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887977 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H04L27/26 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L27/01 (KR);
H04L5/06 (KR);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03522 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/44] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Erzeugung der Adressen eines Koeffizientenspeichers in einem Entzerrer für Mehrträgersignale | [1999/01] | English: | Generation of addresses for a coefficient memory in an equaliser for multicarrier signals | [1999/01] | French: | Génération d'adresses d'une mémoire de coefficients dans un égaliseur pour signaux multiporteurs | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]GB2320872 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [T] 1-9 * page 7, line 7 - page 16, line 1 * * figures 4-7G * | [A] - MIGNONE V ET AL, "CD3-OFDM: A NEW CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD TO IMPROVE THE SPECTRUM EFFICIENCY IN DIGITAL TERRESTRIAL TELEVISION SYSTEMS", IBC '95: INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CONVENTION, AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS, IEE, LONDON, UK, (19950914), no. 413, pages 122 - 128, XP000617513 [A] 1,4 * page 123, column R, line 41 - page 124, column L, line L * * page 124, column R, line 30 - page 125, column R, line 11 * * figures 2,3 * | [A] - SARI H ET AL, "TRANSMISSION TECHNIQUES FOR DIGITAL TERRESTRIAL TV BROADCASTING", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19950201), vol. 33, no. 2, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 100 - 109, XP000505677 [A] 1,4 * page 102, column R, line 1 - page 103, column R, line 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.350382 |