EP0887865 - Optical module with an optoelectronic semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Micro Optics Company Ltd. 8-1 Nishihashimoto 5-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashizume, Hideki, c/o Micro Optics Company Ltd. 8-1 Nishihashimoto 5-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304980.0 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970183123 | 24.06.1997 Original published format: JP 18312397 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887865 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0232, H01L33/00, G02B6/42 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/4255 (EP,US);
G02B6/4244 (EP,US);
G02B6/4245 (EP,US);
G02B6/4292 (EP,US);
H01L31/0203 (EP,US);
H01L31/02325 (EP,US);
G02B6/4251 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optischer Modul mit einem optoelektrischen Halbleiterbauelement | [1999/01] | English: | Optical module with an optoelectronic semiconductor device | [1999/01] | French: | Module optique comprenant un élément semiconducteur optoélectronique | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 01.07.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/17] | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.07.1999 | AT   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | CH   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | CY   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | DK   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | ES   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | FI   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | GR   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | IE   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | LU   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | MC   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | NL   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | PT   M04   Not yet paid | 30.07.1999 | SE   M04   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2002 | 30.06.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63136010 ; | [A]JPS63102543 ; | [X]DE3429282 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [A]DE4022076 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5333224 (KIKUCHI KIMIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0620460 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 47 - line 51; figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881020), vol. 012, no. 394, Database accession no. (P - 773), & JP63136010 A 19880608 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880914), vol. 012, no. 342, Database accession no. (E - 658), & JP63102543 A 19880507 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |