EP0887302 - Winch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEWMAR MARINE LIMITED Southmoor Lane Havant, Hampshire PO9 1JJ / GB | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atfield, Philip John Amberly, 19 Hordean Road Emsworth, Hampshire PO10 7PT / GB | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304985.9 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | GB19970013669 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9713669 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887302 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887302 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B66D1/74 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B66D1/7494 (EP,US);
B66D1/7431 (EP,US);
Y10S242/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Winde | [1999/01] | English: | Winch | [1999/01] | French: | Cabestan | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 03.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/35] | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR387896 (HILLAIRET HUGUET SOC [FR]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE719030 (OTTO REINER DIPL ING) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1281654 (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4453701 (HUGGETT RICHARD D J [GB]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 17 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2138768 (WEBB JOHN THOMAS H) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * claims 1,8 ** figure 3 *; | [XY]EP0759408 (HARKEN INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 21 * * claim 3 * * figure 1 * [Y] 5,7,8 |