EP0889446 - Document recognition apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ross, Gary A. 60 Main Street Colinsburgh, Fife, Scotland / GB | 02 /
Meeran, Sheik 7 Eassons Angele Dundee, Scotland DD2 2LP / GB | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304999.0 | 25.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | GB19970014083 | 04.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9714083 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889446 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889446 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G07D7/0043 (EP,US);
G07D7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/38] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Dokumenten | [1999/01] | English: | Document recognition apparatus | [1999/01] | French: | Appareil pour la reconnaissance de documents | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 11.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.08.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5304813 (DE MAN IVO [CH]) [Y] 1-8,10 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 9,11-13; | [YA]GB2282345 (ATHEY GRAHAM [GB], et al) [Y] 1-8,10 * figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 9,11-13; | [A]GB2284293 (MARS INC [US]) [A] 11-13 * figures 1,5; claim 1 *; | [A]US5522491 (BAUDAT GASTON [CH], et al) [A] 11-13 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO8900319 (GLOBAL SECURITY AB [SE]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2283455 (WILLETT INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0675466 (OESTERR FORSCH SEIBERSDORF [AT]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 * |