EP0947187 - Patient lifting and transport apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Williamson, Theodore A. 648 Ideal Way Charlotte North Carolina 28203 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Williamson, Theodore A. 648 Ideal Way Charlotte, North Carolina 28203 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305048.5 | 26.06.1998 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | US19980054728 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: US 54728 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0947187 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0947187 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
A61G7/1015 (EP,US);
A61G7/1046 (EP,US);
A61G7/1055 (EP,US);
A61G7/1067 (EP,US);
A61G2200/32 (EP,US);
A61G2200/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/27] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum heben und fördern eines Patienten | [1999/40] | English: | Patient lifting and transport apparatus and method | [1999/40] | French: | Appareil et procédé de levage et de transport d'un patient | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 28.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 30.06.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1977944 (HASKETT THOMAS H) [A] 1,21,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4384378 (GETZ CLARENCE A, et al) [A] 1,21,23 * column 5, line 3 - line 17; figure - *; | [A]US5544371 (FULLER CARMEL U [US]) [A] 1,21,23 * column 4, line 29 - line 35; figures 11-14 *; | [AD]US5570483 (WILLIAMSON THEODORE A [US]) [AD] 1,21,23* abstract * |