EP0897702 - Intraocular lens implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visioncare Ltd. 3 Moshe Dayan Road Yehud 56101 / IL | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Yosef 205 Moshav Mazor 73160 / IL | 02 /
Lipshitz, Issac 89a Hanasai Street Herzliya Pituach 36448 / IL | 03 /
Gedeon, Dotan 32 Havradim Street Yehud 56275 / IL | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Gold, Tibor Zoltán, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Gold, Tibor Z., et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305081.6 | 26.06.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | US19970882973 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 882973 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897702 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897702 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/1648 (EP,US);
A61F2/1651 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/03] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Intraokulares Linsenimplantat | [1999/08] | English: | Intraocular lens implant | [1999/08] | French: | Implant intraoculaire | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/26] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9515733 (VOIR ET VIVRE E U R L [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1,3,6 * * page 1, line 25 - line 30 * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 20 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 5 * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 5 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]US5391202 (LIPSHITZ ISAAC [IL], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 22 - line 29 * * column 3, line 13 - line 52 * * claim 1 * * claims 4-6 *; | [AD]US4074368 (LEVY JR CHAUNCEY F, et al) [AD] 1 * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [E]US5814103 (LIPSHITZ ISAAC [IL], et al) [E] 1-5 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 17 * | by applicant | US5391202 | US5354335 | EP0212616 | US4074368 | US4172297 | US4759761 | US5275623 | FR2666735 |