EP0889403 - A snoop filter for use in multiprocessor computer systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2009/40] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phelps, Andrew E 811 Autumn Place Encinitas California 92024 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305109.5 | 29.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970885007 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 885007 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889403 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889403 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889403 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G06F9/5016 (EP,US);
G06F12/0833 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | G06F9/46, G06F12/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2003/05] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Snoopfilter zur Verwendung in Multiprozessor-Rechnersystemen | [1999/01] | English: | A snoop filter for use in multiprocessor computer systems | [1999/01] | French: | Filtre d'écoute destiné à des systèmes d'ordinateur multiprocesseur | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | FR | 30.06.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/44] | NL | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SE | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5297265 (FRANK STEVEN J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,13,15,18,21,24 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 41 * * column 8, line 8 - line 21 * * column 12, line 9 - line 30 * [A] 8,14,16,17,19,22,25,26; | [XA] - IWASA S., SHING S. H., MOGI H., NOZUWE H., HAYASHI H., WAKAMORI O., OHMIZO T., TANAKA K., SAKAI H., SAITO M., "SSM-MP: MORE SCALABILITY IN SHARED-MEMORY MULTI-PROCESSOR", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER DESIGN: VLSI IN COMPUTERS AND PROCESSORS. AUSTIN, IEEE, NEW YORK, US, (19951002), ISBN 0-7803-3124-9, pages 558 - 563, XP000631951 [X] 1,3-6,11,15,18,21,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [03.3] * [A] 2,7,16,17,19,22,25,26 | [XA] - LENOSKI D., LAUDON J., GHARACHORLOO K., WEBER W.-D., GUPTA A., HENNESSY J., HOROWITZ M., LAM M. S., "THE STANFORD DASH MULTIPROCESSOR", COMPUTER, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US,, (19920301), vol. 25, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 63 - 79, XP000288291 [X] 1,4,11,15,21,24-26 * page 64, column R, line 39 - line 51 * * page 66, column L, line 4 - line 31 * * page 68, column L, line 49 - column M, line 28 * * page 71, column R, line 3 - line 14 * * page 72, column R, line 18 - page 73, column L, line 21 * [A] 2,3,5,7,16-19,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.121510 |